1 | 1 | | By: Lewis (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 1263 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House March 20, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | March 21, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Administration; March 25, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 25, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of |
---|
11 | 11 | | small claims courts. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 5.07, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the |
---|
14 | 14 | | 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as |
---|
15 | 15 | | follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 5.07. Not later than May 1, 2013, the Texas Supreme |
---|
17 | 17 | | Court shall promulgate the following rules, to be effective August |
---|
18 | 18 | | 31, 2013: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) rules to define cases that constitute small claims |
---|
20 | 20 | | cases; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) rules of civil procedure applicable to small |
---|
22 | 22 | | claims cases as required by Section 27.060, Government Code, as |
---|
23 | 23 | | added by this article; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) rules for eviction proceedings. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 5.09, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as |
---|
27 | 27 | | follows: |
---|
28 | 28 | | Sec. 5.09. Sections 5.02 and 5.06 of this article take |
---|
29 | 29 | | effect August 31 [May 1], 2013. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
31 | 31 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
32 | 32 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
33 | 33 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
34 | 34 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
35 | 35 | | * * * * * |
---|