Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#740
|
Journal Page: 2903
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2903
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2903
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2902
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2276
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 520
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 520
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|