E | 05/25/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
E | 05/15/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3522 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1845 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3371 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3240 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1773 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2487 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#563 | Journal Page: 2486 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1202 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Filed |