Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1421 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perry, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1421
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of certain seized weapons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 18.19, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and adding
 Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (c)  If there is no prosecution or conviction for an offense
 involving the weapon seized, the magistrate to whom the seizure was
 reported shall, before the 61st day after the date the magistrate
 determines that there will be no prosecution or conviction, notify
 in writing the person found in possession of the weapon that the
 person is entitled to the weapon upon written request to the
 magistrate. The magistrate shall order the weapon returned to the
 person found in possession before the 61st day after the date the
 magistrate receives a request from the person. If the weapon is not
 requested before the 61st day after the date of notification, the
 magistrate shall, before the 121st day after the date of
 notification, order the weapon destroyed, sold at public sale by
 the law enforcement agency holding the weapon or by an auctioneer
 licensed under Chapter 1802, Occupations Code, or forfeited to the
 state for use by the law enforcement agency holding the weapon or by
 a county forensic laboratory designated by the magistrate. If the
 magistrate does not order the return, destruction, sale, or
 forfeiture of the weapon within the applicable period prescribed by
 this subsection, the law enforcement agency holding the weapon may
 request an order of destruction, sale, or forfeiture of the weapon
 from the magistrate. Only a firearms dealer licensed under 18
 U.S.C. Section 923 may purchase a weapon at public sale under this
 subsection. Proceeds from the sale of a seized weapon under this
 subsection shall be transferred, after the deduction of court costs
 to which a district court clerk is entitled under Article 59.05(f),
 followed by the deduction of auction costs, to the law enforcement
 agency holding the weapon.
 (d)  A person either convicted or receiving deferred
 adjudication under Chapter 46, Penal Code, is entitled to the
 weapon seized upon request to the court in which the person was
 convicted or placed on deferred adjudication. However, the court
 entering the judgment shall order the weapon destroyed, sold at
 public sale by the law enforcement agency holding the weapon or by
 an auctioneer licensed under Chapter 1802, Occupations Code, or
 forfeited to the state for use by the law enforcement agency holding
 the weapon or by a county forensic laboratory designated by the
 court if:
 (1)  the person does not request the weapon before the
 61st day after the date of the judgment of conviction or the order
 placing the person on deferred adjudication;
 (2)  the person has been previously convicted under
 Chapter 46, Penal Code;
 (3)  the weapon is one defined as a prohibited weapon
 under Chapter 46, Penal Code;
 (4)  the offense for which the person is convicted or
 receives deferred adjudication was committed in or on the premises
 of a playground, school, video arcade facility, or youth center, as
 those terms are defined by Section 481.134, Health and Safety Code;
 or
 (5)  the court determines based on the prior criminal
 history of the defendant or based on the circumstances surrounding
 the commission of the offense that possession of the seized weapon
 would pose a threat to the community or one or more individuals.
 (d-1)  Only a firearms dealer licensed under 18 U.S.C.
 Section 923 may purchase a weapon at public sale under Subsection
 (d). Proceeds from the sale of a seized weapon under Subsection (d)
 shall be transferred, after the deduction of court costs to which a
 district court clerk is entitled under Article 59.05(f), followed
 by the deduction of auction costs, to the law enforcement agency
 holding the weapon.
 (e)  If the person found in possession of a weapon is
 convicted of an offense involving the use of the weapon, before the
 61st day after the date of conviction the court entering judgment of
 conviction shall order destruction of the weapon, sale at public
 sale by the law enforcement agency holding the weapon or by an
 auctioneer licensed under Chapter 1802, Occupations Code, or
 forfeiture to the state for use by the law enforcement agency
 holding the weapon or by a county forensic laboratory designated by
 the court. If the court entering judgment of conviction does not
 order the destruction, sale, or forfeiture of the weapon within the
 period prescribed by this subsection, the law enforcement agency
 holding the weapon may request an order of destruction, sale, or
 forfeiture of the weapon from a magistrate. Only a firearms dealer
 licensed under 18 U.S.C. Section 923 may purchase a weapon at public
 sale under this subsection. Proceeds from the sale of a seized
 weapon under this subsection shall be transferred, after the
 deduction of court costs to which a district court clerk is entitled
 under Article 59.05(f), followed by the deduction of auction costs,
 to the law enforcement agency holding the weapon.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *