E
|
05/10/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/10/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
E
|
04/29/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1287
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1980
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#138
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1209
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
House
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
House
|
11/13/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|