Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB174 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alonzo, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 174
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; April 23, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 23, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating American Indian Heritage Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.056.  AMERICAN INDIAN HERITAGE DAY. (a) The last
 Friday in September is American Indian Heritage Day in recognition
 of the historic, cultural, and social contributions American Indian
 communities and leaders have made to this state.
 (b)  American Indian Heritage Day shall be regularly
 observed by appropriate ceremonies, activities, and programs in the
 public schools and other places to honor American Indians in this
 state and to celebrate the rich traditional and contemporary
 American Indian culture.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *