E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3674 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3366 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1816 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1328 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#361 | Journal Page: 1968 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1968 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1968 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1964 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1953 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1953 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 616 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 616 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Filed |