Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2058 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2058
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of a high school equivalency
 examination.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.111, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall provide for the administration of high
 school equivalency examinations [, including administration by the
 adjutant general's department for students described by
 Subdivision (2)(C)].
 (a-1)  A person who does not have a high school diploma may
 take the examination in accordance with rules adopted by the board
 if the person is:
 (1)  over 17 years of age;
 (2)  16 years of age or older and:
 (A)  is enrolled in a Job Corps training program
 under the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 (29 U.S.C. Section 2801
 et seq.), and its subsequent amendments;
 (B)  a public agency providing supervision of the
 person or having custody of the person under a court order
 recommends that the person take the examination; or
 (C)  is enrolled in the adjutant general's
 department's Seaborne ChalleNGe Corps; or
 (3)  required to take the examination under a [justice
 or municipal] court order [issued under Article 45.054(a)(1)(C),
 Code of Criminal Procedure].
 (c)  The board by rule shall develop and deliver high school
 equivalency examinations and provide for the administration of the
 examinations online. The rules must [:
 [(1)]  provide a procedure for verifying the identity
 of the person taking the examination [; and
 [(2)     prohibit a person under 18 years of age from
 taking the examination online].
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *