Senate | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1416 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2205 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2205 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2205 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2183 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2183 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 678 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 678 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Filed |