E | 05/16/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/16/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3674 | |
E | 05/06/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2722 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1429 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2363 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2198 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 706 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1218 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#138 | Journal Page: 1218 |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1218 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1218 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1212 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1212 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 699 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 684 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |