Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2377 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2377
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; April 29, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of legislatively produced audio or visual
 materials; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 306.005, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 306.005.  USE OF LEGISLATIVELY PRODUCED AUDIO OR VISUAL
 MATERIALS IN POLITICAL ADVERTISING PROHIBITED. (a) A person may
 not use audio or visual [video] materials produced by or under the
 direction of the legislature or of a house, committee, or agency of
 the legislature in political advertising.
 (b)  After a formal hearing held as provided by Subchapter E,
 Chapter 571, the Texas Ethics Commission may impose a civil penalty
 against a person who violates this section. The amount of the
 penalty may not exceed $5,000 for each violation.
 (c)  Subsection (a) does not prohibit describing or quoting
 the verbal content of the audio or visual [video] materials in
 political advertising.
 (d)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a photograph of a
 current or former member of the legislature obtained from a house,
 committee, or agency of the legislature that is used in accordance
 with terms and conditions established by the entity from which the
 photograph was obtained.
 (e)  In this section:
 (1)  "Political [, "political] advertising" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 251.001, Election Code.
 (2)  "Visual materials" means photographic, video, or
 other material containing a still or moving recorded image or
 images.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 306.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 306.0055.  LEGISLATIVELY PRODUCED PHOTOGRAPHS. A
 house, committee, or agency of the legislature may charge for a
 photograph produced by or under the direction of the entity the fair
 market value of the photograph.
 SECTION 3.  Section 306.006, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 306.006.  COMMERCIAL USE OF LEGISLATIVELY PRODUCED
 AUDIO OR VISUAL MATERIALS. (a) A person may not use audio or visual
 [video] materials produced by or under the direction of the
 legislature or of a house, committee, or agency of the legislature
 for a commercial purpose unless the legislative entity that
 produced the audio or visual [video] materials or under whose
 direction the audio or visual [video] materials were produced gives
 its permission for the person's commercial use and:
 (1)  the person uses the audio or visual [video]
 materials only for educational or public affairs programming,
 including news programming, that does not also constitute a use
 prohibited under Section 306.005; or
 (2)  the person transmits [to paid subscribers] an
 unedited feed of the audio or visual materials:
 (A)  to paid subscribers; or
 (B)  on an Internet website that is accessible to
 the public.
 (b)  A person who violates Subsection (a) commits an offense.
 An offense under this subsection is a Class C misdemeanor.
 (c)  The legislative entity that produced the audio or visual
 [video] materials or under whose direction the audio or visual
 [video] materials were produced shall give its permission to a
 person to use the materials for a commercial purpose described by
 Subsection (a)(1) if the person or the person's representative
 submits to the legislative entity a signed, written request for the
 use that:
 (1)  states the purpose for which the audio or visual
 [video] materials will be used and the stated purpose is allowed
 under Subsection (a)(1); and
 (2)  contains an agreement by the person that the audio
 or visual materials will not be used for a commercial purpose other
 than the stated purpose.
 (d)  Subsection (a)(2) does not apply to visual materials
 consisting of photographs or other still images. A [The]
 legislative entity is not required to give its permission to any
 person to use [the] materials for a purpose described by Subsection
 (a)(2) and may limit the number of persons to whom it gives its
 permission to use [the] materials for a purpose described by
 Subsection (a)(2).
 (e)  Subsection (a) and an agreement under Subsection (c)(2)
 do not prohibit compiling, describing, quoting from, analyzing, or
 researching the verbal content of the audio or visual materials for
 a commercial purpose.
 (f)  In addition to the criminal penalty that may be imposed
 under Subsection (b), the attorney general shall enforce this
 section at the request of the legislative entity by bringing a civil
 action to enjoin a violation of Subsection (a) or of an agreement
 under Subsection (c)(2).
 (g)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commercial [, "commercial] purpose" means a
 purpose that is intended to result in a profit or other tangible
 benefit.
 (2)  "Visual materials" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 306.005.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense or other violation of the law amended by this Act
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An offense or
 other violation of that law committed before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect when the offense or
 violation was committed, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense or other
 violation was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense or violation was committed before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *