E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5442 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5439 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3756 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4870 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4878 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4546 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2899 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2034 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1417 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2206 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 688 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |