Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez, Munoz, Jr., Canales H.B. No. 2424
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the part of U.S. Highway 83 Business
 in Hidalgo and Cameron Counties as a portion of the national Purple
 Heart Trail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 225.0225(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The following highways are designated as the Texas
 portion of the national Purple Heart Trail:
 (1)  the part of Interstate Highway 35 located in
 Texas;
 (2)  the part of Interstate Highway 40 located in
 Texas;
 (3)  the part of Interstate Highway 37 from Interstate
 Highway 35 to U.S. Highway 77;
 (4)  the part of U.S. Highway 77 from Interstate
 Highway 37 to State Highway 100;
 (5)  State Highway 100; [and]
 (6)  Park Road 100; and
 (7)  the part of U.S. Highway 83 Business in Hidalgo and
 Cameron Counties.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *