1 | 1 | | By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2662 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Education; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to a personal financial literacy credit for high school |
---|
11 | 11 | | programs. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 28.002(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
14 | 14 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (a) Each school district that offers kindergarten through |
---|
16 | 16 | | grade 12 shall offer, as a required curriculum: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) a foundation curriculum that includes: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (A) English language arts; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) mathematics; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (C) science; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (D) social studies, consisting of Texas, United |
---|
22 | 22 | | States, and world history, government, economics, with emphasis on |
---|
23 | 23 | | the free enterprise system and its benefits, and geography; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) an enrichment curriculum that includes: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) to the extent possible, languages other than |
---|
26 | 26 | | English; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (B) health, with emphasis on the importance of |
---|
28 | 28 | | proper nutrition and exercise; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (C) physical education; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (D) fine arts; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (E) career and technology education; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (F) technology applications; [and] |
---|
33 | 33 | | (G) religious literature, including the Hebrew |
---|
34 | 34 | | Scriptures (Old Testament) and New Testament, and its impact on |
---|
35 | 35 | | history and literature; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (H) personal financial literacy. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Section 28.0021(a), Education Code, as amended |
---|
38 | 38 | | by Chapters 214 (H.B. 34) and 885 (S.B. 290), Acts of the 82nd |
---|
39 | 39 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted and amended to |
---|
40 | 40 | | read as follows: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (a) The Texas essential knowledge and skills and, as |
---|
42 | 42 | | applicable, Section 28.025 shall include [require] instruction in |
---|
43 | 43 | | personal financial literacy, including instruction in methods of |
---|
44 | 44 | | paying for college and other postsecondary education and training, |
---|
45 | 45 | | in: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (1) mathematics instruction in kindergarten through |
---|
47 | 47 | | grade eight; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) one or more courses offered [required] for high |
---|
49 | 49 | | school graduation. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 3. Sections 28.0021(b) and (c), Education Code, are |
---|
51 | 51 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) Each school district and each open-enrollment charter |
---|
53 | 53 | | school that offers a high school program shall provide an elective |
---|
54 | 54 | | course [to a student instruction] in personal financial literacy |
---|
55 | 55 | | that meets [in any course meeting] the requirements for a one-half |
---|
56 | 56 | | elective [an economics] credit under Section 28.025, using |
---|
57 | 57 | | materials approved by the State Board of Education. The |
---|
58 | 58 | | instruction in personal financial literacy must include |
---|
59 | 59 | | instruction on completing the application for federal student aid |
---|
60 | 60 | | provided by the United States Department of Education. In |
---|
61 | 61 | | fulfilling the requirement to provide financial literacy |
---|
62 | 62 | | instruction under this section, a school district or |
---|
63 | 63 | | open-enrollment charter school may use an existing state, federal, |
---|
64 | 64 | | private, or nonprofit program that provides students without charge |
---|
65 | 65 | | the instruction described under this section. [Each district and |
---|
66 | 66 | | each open-enrollment charter school that offers a high school |
---|
67 | 67 | | program shall ensure that a district or charter school student |
---|
68 | 68 | | enrolled at an institution of higher education in a dual credit |
---|
69 | 69 | | course meeting the requirements for an economics credit under |
---|
70 | 70 | | Section 28.025 receives the instruction described under this |
---|
71 | 71 | | subsection.] |
---|
72 | 72 | | (c) The State Board of Education shall, not later than |
---|
73 | 73 | | January 31, 2012, identify the essential knowledge and skills of |
---|
74 | 74 | | personal financial literacy instruction to include instruction in |
---|
75 | 75 | | methods of paying for college and other postsecondary education and |
---|
76 | 76 | | training and shall, not later than August 31, 2012, approve under |
---|
77 | 77 | | Subsection (b) materials that provide for such |
---|
78 | 78 | | instruction. Beginning with the 2013-2014 school year, each |
---|
79 | 79 | | school district and each open-enrollment charter school that offers |
---|
80 | 80 | | a high school program shall include, in the elective course |
---|
81 | 81 | | [required instruction] in personal financial literacy, instruction |
---|
82 | 82 | | in methods of paying for college and other postsecondary education |
---|
83 | 83 | | and training and use materials approved for that purpose under |
---|
84 | 84 | | Subsection (b) [and shall ensure that the instruction described |
---|
85 | 85 | | under this subsection is provided to a district or charter school |
---|
86 | 86 | | student enrolled at an institution of higher education in a dual |
---|
87 | 87 | | credit course meeting the requirements for an economics |
---|
88 | 88 | | credit]. This subsection expires September 1, 2014. |
---|
89 | 89 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
90 | 90 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
91 | 91 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
92 | 92 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
93 | 93 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
94 | 94 | | * * * * * |
---|