Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2662 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2662
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a personal financial literacy credit for high school
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each school district that offers kindergarten through
 grade 12 shall offer, as a required curriculum:
 (1)  a foundation curriculum that includes:
 (A)  English language arts;
 (B)  mathematics;
 (C)  science; and
 (D)  social studies, consisting of Texas, United
 States, and world history, government, economics, with emphasis on
 the free enterprise system and its benefits, and geography; and
 (2)  an enrichment curriculum that includes:
 (A)  to the extent possible, languages other than
 English;
 (B)  health, with emphasis on the importance of
 proper nutrition and exercise;
 (C)  physical education;
 (D)  fine arts;
 (E)  career and technology education;
 (F)  technology applications; [and]
 (G)  religious literature, including the Hebrew
 Scriptures (Old Testament) and New Testament, and its impact on
 history and literature; and
 (H)  personal financial literacy.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.0021(a), Education Code, as amended
 by Chapters 214 (H.B. 34) and 885 (S.B. 290), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas essential knowledge and skills and, as
 applicable, Section 28.025 shall include [require] instruction in
 personal financial literacy, including instruction in methods of
 paying for college and other postsecondary education and training,
 in:
 (1)  mathematics instruction in kindergarten through
 grade eight; and
 (2)  one or more courses offered [required] for high
 school graduation.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 28.0021(b) and (c), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Each school district and each open-enrollment charter
 school that offers a high school program shall provide an elective
 course [to a student instruction] in personal financial literacy
 that meets [in any course meeting] the requirements for a one-half
 elective [an economics] credit under Section 28.025, using
 materials approved by the State Board of Education.  The
 instruction in personal financial literacy must include
 instruction on completing the application for federal student aid
 provided by the United States Department of Education.  In
 fulfilling the requirement to provide financial literacy
 instruction under this section, a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school may use an existing state, federal,
 private, or nonprofit program that provides students without charge
 the instruction described under this section. [Each district and
 each open-enrollment charter school that offers a high school
 program shall ensure that a district or charter school student
 enrolled at an institution of higher education in a dual credit
 course meeting the requirements for an economics credit under
 Section 28.025 receives the instruction described under this
 subsection.]
 (c)  The State Board of Education shall, not later than
 January 31, 2012, identify the essential knowledge and skills of
 personal financial literacy instruction to include instruction in
 methods of paying for college and other postsecondary education and
 training and shall, not later than August 31, 2012, approve under
 Subsection (b) materials that provide for such
 instruction.  Beginning with the 2013-2014 school year, each
 school district and each open-enrollment charter school that offers
 a high school program shall include, in the elective course
 [required instruction] in personal financial literacy, instruction
 in methods of paying for college and other postsecondary education
 and training and use materials approved for that purpose under
 Subsection (b) [and shall ensure that the instruction described
 under this subsection is provided to a district or charter school
 student enrolled at an institution of higher education in a dual
 credit course meeting the requirements for an economics
 credit].  This subsection expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *