Senate | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2587 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#605 | Journal Page: 2586 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2523 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2523 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Filed |