House | 05/07/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2626 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1538 | Journal Page: 2625 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Postponed | 5/7/13 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2512 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 949 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 949 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |