E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4552
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2908
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1731
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|