Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3934 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Riddle (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 3934
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2013;
 May 14, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to powers of the North Harris County Regional Water
 Authority relating to certain wells.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4.03, Chapter 1029, Acts of the 76th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1999, is amended by adding Subsection
 (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, the authority may impose
 a charge under Subsection (b) on a well or class of wells located
 within the boundaries of the authority that, on or after June 30,
 2013:
 (1)  ceases to be subject to a groundwater reduction
 requirement imposed by the subsidence district; or
 (2)  is no longer subject to the regulatory provisions,
 permitting requirements, or jurisdiction of the subsidence
 district.
 SECTION 2.  The North Harris County Regional Water Authority
 retains all rights, powers, privileges, authorities, duties, and
 functions that it had before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The legislature validates and confirms all
 governmental acts and proceedings of the North Harris County
 Regional Water Authority that were taken before the effective date
 of this Act.
 (b)  This section does not apply to any matter that on the
 effective date of this Act:
 (1)  is involved in litigation if the litigation
 ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court
 judgment; or
 (2)  has been held invalid by a final court judgment.
 SECTION 4.  (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *