E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3669
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 704
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#141
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1197
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Burkett
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
House
|
01/10/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|