Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB424 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett, Sheets, Fletcher H.B. No. 424
 (Senate Sponsor - Deuell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sex offender status of a person who becomes a
 resident of certain group home facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle G, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 325 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 325. NOTICE OF SEX OFFENDER STATUS TO RESIDENTS OF GROUP
 HOME
 Sec. 325.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Director" means the administrator primarily
 responsible for the operation of a group home.
 (2)  "Group home" includes:
 (A)  an assisted living facility, as defined by
 Section 247.002;
 (B)  a boarding home facility, as defined by
 Section 260.001;
 (C)  a facility as defined by Section 246.002;
 (D)  a supportive housing facility operated by the
 state, a local government, or a private agency that provides
 supportive services to persons with mental illness, substance use
 conditions, or physical disabilities who require access to
 rehabilitative services and a stable living arrangement to maintain
 consistent treatment regimens; and
 (E)  a transitional housing facility designed to
 facilitate the transition from inpatient to outpatient care or,
 within a reasonable time, the transition from homelessness to
 permanent housing for persons with serious mental illnesses,
 substance use conditions, or physical disabilities and who may
 require intensive case management and assistance with long-term
 goal planning and independent living skills.
 (3)  "Resident" means a person who resides and receives
 services at a group home.
 Sec. 325.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter does
 not apply to a group home that accepts or is assigned only residents
 who are sex offenders required to register under Chapter 62, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, if the residents receive treatment at the group
 home from a sex offender treatment provider who is licensed under
 Chapter 110, Occupations Code.
 Sec. 325.003.  SEX OFFENDER STATUS CHECK. Except as
 provided by Section 325.002, as soon as practicable after a person
 requests to live at a group home or is assigned to live at a group
 home as a condition of community supervision or as a condition of
 release on parole or to mandatory supervision, the director of the
 group home shall ascertain whether the person is registered under
 Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure, by consulting the Internet
 website maintained by the Department of Public Safety that contains
 the sex offender database.
 Sec. 325.004.  NOTICE TO OTHER RESIDENTS REQUIRED. If based
 on information obtained under Section 325.003 the director
 ascertains that a person is a registered sex offender, not later
 than the third day after the date the person becomes a resident of
 the group home, the director shall provide notice that the person is
 a sex offender to the legal guardian of each current resident who
 has a legal guardian and directly to each other resident. The
 notice must contain all of the information about the person that is
 available on the website described by Section 325.003.
 Sec. 325.005.  IMMUNITY FOR RELEASE OF PUBLIC INFORMATION.
 A group home or its director is not liable under any law for damages
 arising from conduct required under this chapter.
 Sec. 325.006.  NOTICE ABOUT CURRENT RESIDENTS. Not later
 than March 1, 2014, the director of a group home shall ascertain, in
 the manner provided by Section 325.003, whether any resident of the
 group home is registered under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, and provide to the legal guardian of each current
 resident who has a legal guardian, and directly to each other
 resident, notice about each resident who is required to register
 under that chapter as provided by Section 325.004. This section
 expires April 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *