1 | 1 | | By: Burkett, Sheets, Fletcher H.B. No. 424 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) |
---|
3 | 3 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
5 | 5 | | and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
6 | 6 | | following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the sex offender status of a person who becomes a |
---|
12 | 12 | | resident of certain group home facilities. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle G, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Chapter 325 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | CHAPTER 325. NOTICE OF SEX OFFENDER STATUS TO RESIDENTS OF GROUP |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOME |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 325.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) "Director" means the administrator primarily |
---|
20 | 20 | | responsible for the operation of a group home. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) "Group home" includes: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (A) an assisted living facility, as defined by |
---|
23 | 23 | | Section 247.002; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (B) a boarding home facility, as defined by |
---|
25 | 25 | | Section 260.001; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (C) a facility as defined by Section 246.002; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (D) a supportive housing facility operated by the |
---|
28 | 28 | | state, a local government, or a private agency that provides |
---|
29 | 29 | | supportive services to persons with mental illness, substance use |
---|
30 | 30 | | conditions, or physical disabilities who require access to |
---|
31 | 31 | | rehabilitative services and a stable living arrangement to maintain |
---|
32 | 32 | | consistent treatment regimens; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (E) a transitional housing facility designed to |
---|
34 | 34 | | facilitate the transition from inpatient to outpatient care or, |
---|
35 | 35 | | within a reasonable time, the transition from homelessness to |
---|
36 | 36 | | permanent housing for persons with serious mental illnesses, |
---|
37 | 37 | | substance use conditions, or physical disabilities and who may |
---|
38 | 38 | | require intensive case management and assistance with long-term |
---|
39 | 39 | | goal planning and independent living skills. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) "Resident" means a person who resides and receives |
---|
41 | 41 | | services at a group home. |
---|
42 | 42 | | Sec. 325.002. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter does |
---|
43 | 43 | | not apply to a group home that accepts or is assigned only residents |
---|
44 | 44 | | who are sex offenders required to register under Chapter 62, Code of |
---|
45 | 45 | | Criminal Procedure, if the residents receive treatment at the group |
---|
46 | 46 | | home from a sex offender treatment provider who is licensed under |
---|
47 | 47 | | Chapter 110, Occupations Code. |
---|
48 | 48 | | Sec. 325.003. SEX OFFENDER STATUS CHECK. Except as |
---|
49 | 49 | | provided by Section 325.002, as soon as practicable after a person |
---|
50 | 50 | | requests to live at a group home or is assigned to live at a group |
---|
51 | 51 | | home as a condition of community supervision or as a condition of |
---|
52 | 52 | | release on parole or to mandatory supervision, the director of the |
---|
53 | 53 | | group home shall ascertain whether the person is registered under |
---|
54 | 54 | | Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure, by consulting the Internet |
---|
55 | 55 | | website maintained by the Department of Public Safety that contains |
---|
56 | 56 | | the sex offender database. |
---|
57 | 57 | | Sec. 325.004. NOTICE TO OTHER RESIDENTS REQUIRED. If based |
---|
58 | 58 | | on information obtained under Section 325.003 the director |
---|
59 | 59 | | ascertains that a person is a registered sex offender, not later |
---|
60 | 60 | | than the third day after the date the person becomes a resident of |
---|
61 | 61 | | the group home, the director shall provide notice that the person is |
---|
62 | 62 | | a sex offender to the legal guardian of each current resident who |
---|
63 | 63 | | has a legal guardian and directly to each other resident. The |
---|
64 | 64 | | notice must contain all of the information about the person that is |
---|
65 | 65 | | available on the website described by Section 325.003. |
---|
66 | 66 | | Sec. 325.005. IMMUNITY FOR RELEASE OF PUBLIC INFORMATION. |
---|
67 | 67 | | A group home or its director is not liable under any law for damages |
---|
68 | 68 | | arising from conduct required under this chapter. |
---|
69 | 69 | | Sec. 325.006. NOTICE ABOUT CURRENT RESIDENTS. Not later |
---|
70 | 70 | | than March 1, 2014, the director of a group home shall ascertain, in |
---|
71 | 71 | | the manner provided by Section 325.003, whether any resident of the |
---|
72 | 72 | | group home is registered under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal |
---|
73 | 73 | | Procedure, and provide to the legal guardian of each current |
---|
74 | 74 | | resident who has a legal guardian, and directly to each other |
---|
75 | 75 | | resident, notice about each resident who is required to register |
---|
76 | 76 | | under that chapter as provided by Section 325.004. This section |
---|
77 | 77 | | expires April 1, 2014. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
79 | 79 | | * * * * * |
---|