House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2270 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 01/14/2013 | Filed |