Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB509 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 83R27175 TJB-D
22 By: Murphy, Harper-Brown, Harless, H.B. No. 509
33 Hilderbran, et al.
44 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 509:
55 By: Hilderbran C.S.H.B. No. 509
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering
1111 the rates of the taxes.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2014, Sections
1414 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
1515 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
1616 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.75
1717 [one] percent of taxable margin.
1818 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
1919 the franchise tax is 0.38 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
2020 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
2121 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
2222 or after January 1, 2014.
2323 SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2015, Sections
2424 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
2525 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
2626 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.50
2727 [one] percent of taxable margin.
2828 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
2929 the franchise tax is 0.25 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
3030 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
3131 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
3232 or after January 1, 2015.
3333 SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections
3434 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
3535 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
3636 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25
3737 [one] percent of taxable margin.
3838 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
3939 the franchise tax is 0.13 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
4040 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
4141 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
4242 or after January 1, 2016.
4343 SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2014, Section
4444 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
4545 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
4646 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
4747 computed by:
4848 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
4949 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
5050 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
5151 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
5252 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
5353 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
5454 (2) by the rate of 0.43 [0.575] percent.
5555 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
5656 or after January 1, 2014.
5757 SECTION 5. (a) Effective January 1, 2015, Section
5858 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
5959 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
6060 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
6161 computed by:
6262 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
6363 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
6464 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
6565 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
6666 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
6767 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
6868 (2) by the rate of 0.29 [0.575] percent.
6969 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
7070 or after January 1, 2015.
7171 SECTION 6. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section
7272 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
7373 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
7474 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
7575 computed by:
7676 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
7777 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
7878 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
7979 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
8080 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
8181 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
8282 (2) by the rate of 0.14 [0.575] percent.
8383 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
8484 or after January 1, 2016.
8585 SECTION 7. Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
8686 as follows:
8787 (b) Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered
8888 year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[,
8989 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount
9090 equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of
9191 the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or
9292 decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer
9393 price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000.
9494 SECTION 8. Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
9595 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
9696 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
9797 Session, 2011, is repealed.
9898 SECTION 9. Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
9999 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
100100 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
101101 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section
102102 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed.
103103 SECTION 10. Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
104104 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
105105 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
106106 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section
107107 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed.
108108 SECTION 11. Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code,
109109 are repealed.
110110 SECTION 12. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
111111 (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
112112 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2016, shall
113113 file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as
114114 required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2017. The
115115 transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have
116116 paid in 2017 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code,
117117 had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code,
118118 relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain
119119 in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section
120120 for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax
121121 required by this subsection.
122122 (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax
123123 Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations,
124124 and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including
125125 the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until
126126 barred by limitations.
127127 (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
128128 (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its
129129 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
130130 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
131131 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
132132 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
133133 (2) the ability of the comptroller, secretary of
134134 state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity
135135 under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took
136136 place before the repeal; or
137137 (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a
138138 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
139139 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
140140 (e) This section takes effect January 1, 2017.
141141 SECTION 13. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
142142 Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the
143143 effective date of this Act.
144144 SECTION 14. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
145145 Act takes effect January 1, 2014.