83R27175 TJB-D By: Murphy, Harper-Brown, Harless, H.B. No. 509 Hilderbran, et al. Substitute the following for H.B. No. 509: By: Hilderbran C.S.H.B. No. 509 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering the rates of the taxes. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2014, Sections 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.75 [one] percent of taxable margin. (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of the franchise tax is 0.38 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2015, Sections 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.50 [one] percent of taxable margin. (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2015. SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25 [one] percent of taxable margin. (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of the franchise tax is 0.13 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2016. SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2014, Section 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is computed by: (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; (2) apportioning the amount computed under Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision (2) by the rate of 0.43 [0.575] percent. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 5. (a) Effective January 1, 2015, Section 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is computed by: (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; (2) apportioning the amount computed under Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision (2) by the rate of 0.29 [0.575] percent. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2015. SECTION 6. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is computed by: (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; (2) apportioning the amount computed under Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision (2) by the rate of 0.14 [0.575] percent. (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2016. SECTION 7. Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[, 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000. SECTION 8. Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is repealed. SECTION 9. Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed. SECTION 10. Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed. SECTION 11. Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are repealed. SECTION 12. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed. (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2016, shall file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2017. The transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have paid in 2017 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code, had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code, relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax required by this subsection. (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations, and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until barred by limitations. (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect: (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter; (2) the ability of the comptroller, secretary of state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took place before the repeal; or (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter. (e) This section takes effect January 1, 2017. SECTION 13. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the effective date of this Act. SECTION 14. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this Act takes effect January 1, 2014.