E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3674 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3364 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1812 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1293 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1216 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Record vote | RV#296 | Journal Page: 1805 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1766 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1766 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 693 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 340 | |
House | 01/14/2013 | Filed |