Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB511 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murphy (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 511
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2013;
 April 29, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the registration of token trailers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.0023, Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  A license plate issued under this section:
 (1)  may, on request of the owner, include the name or
 logo of the business entity that owns the vehicle;
 (2)  except as provided by Subsection (d-1), must
 include the expiration date of the registration period; and
 (3)  does not require an annual registration insignia
 to be valid.
 (d-1)  The department shall issue a license plate for a token
 trailer registered under this section that does not expire. The
 alphanumeric pattern for a license plate issued under this
 subsection may remain on a token trailer for as long as the
 registration of the token trailer is renewed or until the token
 trailer is removed from service or sold. The registration receipt
 required under Section 621.002 is not required for a vehicle that
 displays a license plate issued under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 502.255(i), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (i)  The department shall issue a license plate for a token
 trailer registered under this section that does not expire or
 require an annual registration insignia to be valid.  The
 alphanumeric pattern for a license plate issued under this
 subsection may remain on a token trailer for as long as the
 registration of the token trailer is renewed or until the token
 trailer is removed from service or sold. The registration receipt
 required under Section 621.002 is not required for a vehicle that
 displays a license plate issued under this subsection [may issue
 specially designed license plates for token trailers].
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Department of Motor Vehicles shall
 adopt rules for the administration of Sections 502.0023 and
 502.255(i), Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as
 practicable after this Act takes effect. For that purpose, the
 department may adopt the rules in the manner provided by law for
 emergency rules.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *