House | 04/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1480 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1480 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1179 | |
House | 03/22/2013 | Filed |