E | 05/18/2013 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | April 1, 2015 | |
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1421 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2207 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3281 | Journal Page: 2187 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1455 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1455 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1424 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | CA1 Duncan | Journal Page: 700 |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Ordered not printed | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |