House
|
05/20/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3241
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1870
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1775
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1170
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|