House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 563 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 115 | |
Senate | 11/27/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/27/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |