Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB132 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson, Patrick S.B. No. 132
 (In the Senate - Filed November 27, 2012; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 March 12, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 12, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the contents and applicability of a school district's
 grading policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.0216, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0216.  DISTRICT GRADING POLICY.  (a)  Before each
 school year, a [A] school district shall adopt a grading policy,
 including provisions for the assignment of grades on class
 assignments and examinations and the calculation of cumulative
 averages of grades[, before each school year].  A district grading
 policy:
 (1)  must require a [classroom] teacher to assign a
 grade that reflects the student's relative mastery of the subject
 without employing grade inflation or misrepresenting a student's
 deserved grade [an assignment];
 (2)  may not require a [classroom] teacher to assign a
 minimum grade [for an assignment] without regard to the student's
 quality of work; and
 (3)  may allow a student a reasonable opportunity to
 make up or redo a class assignment or examination for which the
 student received a failing grade.
 (b)  A district grading policy shall apply to the assignment
 of a grade for which written notice is required under Section
 28.022(a)(2), in addition to any other grade assigned by the
 district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *