House | 05/01/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1421 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 84 | |
Senate | 12/19/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |