Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB150 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson, Schwertner S.B. No. 150
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2012; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 4, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 4, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cancer prevention and research fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 102.201, Health
 and Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The cancer prevention and research fund consists of:
 (1)  patent, royalty, and license fees and other income
 received under a contract entered into as provided by Section
 102.255;
 (2)  appropriations of money to the fund by the
 legislature, except that the appropriated money may not include the
 proceeds from the issuance of bonds authorized by Section 67,
 Article III, Texas Constitution;
 (3)  gifts, grants, including grants from the federal
 government, and other donations received for the fund; and
 (4)  interest earned on the investment of money in the
 fund.
 (c)  The fund may be used only to pay for:
 (1)  grants for cancer research and for cancer research
 facilities in this state to realize therapies, protocols, and
 medical procedures for the cure or substantial mitigation of all
 types of cancer in humans;
 (2)  the purchase, subject to approval by the
 institute, of laboratory facilities by or on behalf of a state
 agency or grant recipient;
 (3)  grants to public or private persons to implement
 the Texas Cancer Plan;
 (4)  the operation of the institute; [and]
 (5)  grants for cancer prevention and control programs
 in this state to mitigate the incidence of all types of cancer in
 humans; and
 (6)  debt service on bonds issued as authorized by
 Section 67, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *