House | 05/15/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3017 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |