Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1506 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1506
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 19, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 8, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1506 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training regarding fire safety inspections required by
 law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 419.909, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Only an individual certified by the commission as a fire
 inspector may conduct a fire safety inspection required by a state
 or local law, rule, regulation, or ordinance.  The following
 entities may provide training related to fire safety inspections:
 (1)  the commission;
 (2)  the State Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association
 of Texas;
 (3)  the National Fire Protection Association;
 (4)  a public junior college;
 (5)  a regional fire academy; or
 (6)  any state agency with authority over fire safety
 inspections.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *