Senate | 05/14/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |