Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB191 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Birdwell, Nelson, Schwertner S.B. No. 191
 (In the Senate - Filed January 18, 2013; January 29, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; May 6, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3;
 May 6, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 191 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Temporary Assistance for Needy Families benefits
 accounts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 31.0355, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  If a recipient of financial assistance who receives the
 assistance by electronic benefits transfer to an account is
 authorized to make a cash withdrawal from the account through a
 provider of the goods or services described by Subsection (a), the
 recipient may make the cash withdrawal only:
 (1)  at the customer service department of the provider
 and not at the provider's point-of-sale terminal; and
 (2)  after the provider verifies the recipient's
 identity in accordance with Section 31.0356, if applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 31, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 31.0356 and 31.0357 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 31.0356.  PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FOR CERTAIN CASH
 WITHDRAWALS. (a)  In this section, "photo identification" means a
 card or other document that:
 (1)  is issued by a governmental entity to identify an
 individual; and
 (2)  displays a photograph of the individual identified
 on the card or other document.
 (b)  A recipient of financial assistance who receives the
 assistance by electronic benefits transfer to an account may not,
 using an electronic benefits transfer card subject to Section
 31.0357(a), make a cash withdrawal from the account through a
 provider of the goods or services described by Section 31.0355(a)
 unless the recipient presents photo identification verifying the
 recipient's identity as the card holder.  A provider may presume
 that an electronic benefits transfer card that does not display the
 name of a recipient and any other authorized person is not subject
 to Section 31.0357(a) for purposes of this section.
 Sec. 31.0357.  NAMES ON ELECTRONIC BENEFITS TRANSFER CARDS.
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), each electronic benefits
 transfer card issued to a recipient, or other person authorized on
 the recipient's account, for purposes of delivering benefits under
 the financial assistance program must display the name of the
 recipient and any other authorized person, if applicable.
 (b)  An electronic benefits transfer card issued by a local
 commission eligibility office is not subject to Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2013, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall ensure that electronic benefits
 transfer cards issued for purposes of delivering benefits to
 recipients under the financial assistance program under Chapter 31,
 Human Resources Code, conform to Subsection (a), Section 31.0357,
 Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *