House | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 124 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 124 | |
Senate | 01/25/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |