1 | 1 | | By: Deuell, Schwertner S.B. No. 256 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2013; January 29, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 18, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 256 By: Zaffirini |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to tracking career information for graduates of Texas |
---|
13 | 13 | | medical schools and persons completing medical residency programs |
---|
14 | 14 | | in Texas. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
17 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 61.0906 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 61.0906. TRACKING SYSTEM FOR MEDICAL TRAINING AND |
---|
19 | 19 | | PRACTICE CHOICES. (a) The board by rule shall establish a system |
---|
20 | 20 | | under which the board acquires and maintains data regarding the |
---|
21 | 21 | | initial residency program choices made by graduates of medical |
---|
22 | 22 | | schools in this state and the initial practice choices made by |
---|
23 | 23 | | persons completing medical residency programs in this state. The |
---|
24 | 24 | | tracking system must: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) use any data reasonably available to the board, |
---|
26 | 26 | | including data maintained by or accessible to medical schools or |
---|
27 | 27 | | residency programs in this state; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) with respect to a person who completes a medical |
---|
29 | 29 | | residency program in this state, collect relevant information for |
---|
30 | 30 | | the two-year period following completion of that program. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (b) For purposes of Subsection (a)(2), relevant information |
---|
32 | 32 | | includes: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) whether and for how long physicians who complete |
---|
34 | 34 | | medical residency programs in this state work in primary care in |
---|
35 | 35 | | this state and which medical specialties they report as their |
---|
36 | 36 | | primary medical practice; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) the locations of the practices established by |
---|
38 | 38 | | those persons. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 2. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective |
---|
40 | 40 | | date of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board |
---|
41 | 41 | | shall adopt rules for the implementation and administration of the |
---|
42 | 42 | | tracking system established under Section 61.0906, Education Code, |
---|
43 | 43 | | as added by this Act. The board may adopt the initial rules in the |
---|
44 | 44 | | manner provided by law for emergency rules. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) Not later than January 1, 2014, the Texas Higher |
---|
46 | 46 | | Education Coordinating Board shall establish the tracking system |
---|
47 | 47 | | required by Section 61.0906, Education Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
49 | 49 | | * * * * * |
---|