House | 05/14/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1557 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1512 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |