Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB272 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Seliger S.B. No. 272
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2013; February 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 272 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to water well recordkeeping and reporting requirements,
 including the production and use of groundwater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 36.111, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The district shall keep and may require that records be
 kept and reports be made of the drilling, equipping, and completing
 of water wells and of the production and use of groundwater and
 shall annually provide those records and reports to the Texas Water
 Development Board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *