Senate | 03/20/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 324 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |