Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB370 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 370
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2013; February 11, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 February 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; February 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain current and former members of the
 state legislature to conduct a marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2.202, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The following persons are authorized to conduct a
 marriage ceremony:
 (1)  a licensed or ordained Christian minister or
 priest;
 (2)  a Jewish rabbi;
 (3)  a person who is an officer of a religious
 organization and who is authorized by the organization to conduct a
 marriage ceremony; [and]
 (4)  a justice of the supreme court, judge of the court
 of criminal appeals, justice of the courts of appeals, judge of the
 district, county, and probate courts, judge of the county courts at
 law, judge of the courts of domestic relations, judge of the
 juvenile courts, retired justice or judge of those courts, justice
 of the peace, retired justice of the peace, judge of a municipal
 court, or judge or magistrate of a federal court of this state;
 (5)  a current member of the state legislature who has
 served as a member of the legislature for not less than 20 years; or
 (6)  a former member of the state legislature who
 served as a member of the legislature for not less than 20 years.
 (a-1)  A person authorized to conduct a marriage ceremony
 under Subsection (a)(5) or (6) may not conduct more than 12 marriage
 ceremonies in a 12-month period.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *