E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
November 1, 2013
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2005
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#832
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3226
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3226
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 749
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 443
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 235
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 178
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 178
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|