House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |