Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB476 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 476
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 March 25, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 476 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to installment agreements for the payment of delinquent ad
 valorem taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.02, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The collector for a taxing unit may enter into an
 agreement with a person delinquent in the payment of the tax for
 payment of the tax, penalties, and interest in installments.  The
 collector for a taxing unit shall, on request by a person delinquent
 in the payment of the tax on a residence homestead, enter into an
 agreement with the person for payment of the tax, penalties, and
 interest in installments if the person has not entered into an
 installment agreement with the collector for the taxing unit under
 this section in the preceding 24 months. An installment [The]
 agreement under this section:
 (1)  must be in writing;
 (2)  must provide for payments to be made in equal
 monthly installments;
 (3)  must extend for a period of at least 12 months; and
 (4)  may not extend for a period of more than 36 months.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), interest
 [Interest] and a penalty accrue as provided by Sections 33.01(a)
 and (c) [Subsections (a) and (c) of Section 33.01] on the unpaid
 balance during the period of the agreement.
 (b-1)  A penalty does not accrue as provided by Section
 33.01(a) on the unpaid balance during the period of the agreement if
 the property that is the subject of the agreement is a residence
 homestead.
 SECTION 2.  Section 33.04, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 33.04.  NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY. (a)  At least once each
 year the collector for a taxing unit shall deliver a notice of
 delinquency to each person whose name appears on the current
 delinquent tax roll. However, the notice need not be delivered if:
 (1)  a bill for the tax was not mailed under Section
 31.01(f); or
 (2)  the collector does not know and by exercising
 reasonable diligence cannot determine the delinquent taxpayer's
 name and address.
 (b)  A notice of delinquency must contain the following
 statement in capital letters:  "IF THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS
 DOCUMENT IS YOUR RESIDENCE HOMESTEAD, YOU SHOULD CONTACT THE (NAME
 OF TAXING UNIT) REGARDING A RIGHT YOU MAY HAVE TO ENTER INTO AN
 INSTALLMENT AGREEMENT DIRECTLY WITH THE (NAME OF TAXING UNIT) FOR
 THE PAYMENT OF THESE TAXES."
 (c)  The collector for a taxing unit must deliver a notice of
 delinquency to a person who is in breach of an installment agreement
 under Section 33.02 and to any other owner of an interest in the
 property subject to the agreement whose name appears on the
 delinquent tax roll before the collector may seize and sell the
 property or file a suit to collect a delinquent tax subject to the
 agreement.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 51, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 51.0011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.0011.  DEFAULT ARISING FROM DELINQUENT AD VALOREM
 TAXES:  INSTALLMENT AGREEMENTS. (a)  Notwithstanding any
 agreement to the contrary, a debtor is not in default under a deed
 of trust or other contract lien on real property used as the
 debtor's residence for the delinquent payment of ad valorem taxes
 if:
 (1)  the debtor gave notice to the mortgage servicer of
 the intent to enter into an installment agreement with the taxing
 unit under Section 33.02, Tax Code, for the payment of the taxes at
 least 10 days before the date the debtor entered into the agreement;
 and
 (2)  the property is protected from seizure and sale
 and a suit may not be filed to collect a delinquent tax on the
 property as provided by Section 33.02(d), Tax Code.
 (b)  A mortgage servicer who receives a notice described by
 Subsection (a)(1) may pay the taxes subject to the installment
 agreement at any time.
 (c)  A mortgage servicer who receives a notice described by
 Subsection (a)(1) and gives the debtor notice that the mortgage
 servicer intends to accelerate the note securing the deed of trust
 or other contract lien as a result of the delinquency of the taxes
 that are subject to the installment agreement must rescind the
 notice if the debtor enters into the agreement not later than the
 30th day after the date the debtor delivers the notice.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The change in law made by this Act to
 Section 33.02, Tax Code, applies only to an installment agreement
 for the payment of delinquent ad valorem taxes entered into on or
 after the effective date of this Act. An installment agreement for
 the payment of delinquent ad valorem taxes entered into before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the agreement was entered into, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act to Section 33.04, Tax
 Code, applies only to a notice of delinquency delivered on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A notice of delinquency delivered
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the notice was delivered, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *