Senate | 03/27/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 397 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |