Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB714 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 714
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2013; February 25, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 11, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 1; March 11, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to birth records of certain adopted children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 192.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  If an adult adoptee who does not know the identity of one
 or both parents listed on the person's original birth certificate
 applies for access to the person's original birth certificate, the
 state registrar shall perform a search of reasonably available
 death records to determine if each parent named on the original
 birth certificate whose identity is unknown to the adoptee is
 deceased. Upon confirmation that each parent named on the original
 birth certificate whose identity is unknown to the adoptee is
 deceased, the registrar shall provide to the person a noncertified
 copy of the person's original birth certificate without a court
 order.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 application for an original birth certificate filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act, regardless of whether the suit for
 adoption was filed before, on, or after the effective date of this
 Act. An application for an original birth certificate filed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the application was filed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *