House | 05/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1697 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Williams | Journal Page: 1004 |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Postponed | Journal Page: 965 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 964 |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 964 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |